MATH SOLVE

9 months ago

Q:
# Find the product of 27×60 then explain how you would use mental math to find the product of 27×600

Accepted Solution

A:

27x6

162

27x60

1620

27x600=

16200

the product will be 16200 because 60x10 is equal to 600

27x60 is 1620 you also multiply it by 10

162

27x60

1620

27x600=

16200

the product will be 16200 because 60x10 is equal to 600

27x60 is 1620 you also multiply it by 10